Rodrigues, Paulo Roberto Dornelles (CPSO#: 44031)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.R.D. Rodrigues Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Trillium Health Partners Mississauga Site 100 Queensway West Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Date Received: 24 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic and Therapeutic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014