Rodriguez Molares, Mercedes Cristina (CPSO#: 102089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-7575
Fax: (519)941-7060
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rodriguez Molares Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rodriguez Molares ( CPSO# 102089)

Business Address:
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERCEDES CRISTINA RODRIGUEZ MOLARES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ MOLARES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015