Rodriguez, Sylvia Louise (CPSO#: 80780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Medical Place 2
89 Dawson Road, Suite 214
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 265-9022
Fax: 226-486-0170
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sylvia L. Rodriguez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rodriguez ( CPSO# 80780 )

Business Address:
Guelph Medical Place 2
Suite 214
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 265-9022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVIA LOUISE RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009