Rodriguez-Elizalde, Sebastian Rahul (CPSO#: 81389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3695 Keele street
2ND FLOOR
M3J 1N2
North York, Ontario
Toronto ON  M3K 1E5
Phone: (416) 636-8626
Fax: (416) 636-8628
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Rodriguez-Elizalde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rodriguez-Elizalde ( CPSO# 81389 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )

Business Address:
810 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1E5
Phone Number: (416) 636-8626


Corporation Name: Kalesha Hack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rodriguez-Elizalde ( CPSO# 81389 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M6 252 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN RAHUL RODRIGUEZ-ELIZALDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ-ELIZALDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009