Rody, Caelen Alexandra (CPSO#: 98481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone: (705) 264-1313
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Ross Ave East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caelen Rody Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rody ( CPSO# 98481 )

Business Address:
Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 1C6
Phone Number: (705) 264-1313

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAELEN ALEXANDRA RODY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2015