Roedde, Stephen August (CPSO#: 55367)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014