Roeske, Amy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 80787)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: Rodgers, Amy Elizabeth (used until: 12 Apr 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Department of Anaesthesiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Fax: (613) 738-4815
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100-2255 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Z5
Canada
Phone: (613) 828-2230
Fax: (613) 828-1771
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY ELIZABETH ROESKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROESKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2010