Rogakou, Cleo Chariklia (CPSO#: 52070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1983

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
712 Davis Drive
suite 211
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 898-4328
Fax: (905) 898-3249
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
550 davis drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C4
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2594
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cleo Rogakou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rogakou ( CPSO# 52070 )

Business Address:
211 - 712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 848-4328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLEO CHARIKLIA ROGAKOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGAKOU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1983

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Mar 1992
Summary:

 In March 1992, Dr. Rogakou pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 
 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that she failed to maintain the standard of 
 practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Rogakou 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Rogakou be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further 
 ruled that the Doctor's licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that 
 this suspension would itself be suspended subject to the following conditions:

1.	An inspection 
 and assessment of Dr. Rogakou(s practice was to be conducted by an inspector appointed by the 
 Registrar and at a time to be stipulated by the Registrar.

2.	Should the inspector recommend 
 remedial actions, then these were to be completed to the satisfaction of the Registrar and within 
 the time limit specified by the Registrar.

3.	Should remedial actions be recommended, then there 
 was to be a re-inspection of Dr. Rogakou(s practice one year after the Registrar had received the 
 inspector(s original report.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 16 Mar 1992