Rogenstein, Carly Danielle (CPSO#: 95836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carly Rogenstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rogenstein ( CPSO# 95836 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 401-8013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLY DANIELLE ROGENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 18 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014