Rogers, Carolyn Jean (CPSO#: 62579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medica One
2079 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7R 1E2
Phone: 905-634-1625
Fax: 905-6345332
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN JEAN ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1992