Rogers, James David (CPSO#: 55795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
390 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4J4
Phone: (905) 632-8162
Fax: (905) 632-9810
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rogers ( CPSO# 55795 )

Business Address:
405 - 390 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 4J4
Phone Number: (905) 632-8162

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986