Rogers, Kent Hayward (CPSO#: 31266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1979

Summary

Former Name: Rogers, Kent Howard (used until: 24 Sep 1981 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
American Anesthesiology of Georgia
Suite 515
1984 Peachtree Road Northwest
Atlanta, GA 30309
Atlanta GA  30309
United States
Phone: (404) 351-1745
Fax: (404) 351-7121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENT HAYWARD ROGERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROGERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1979