Rogers, Kieran Anthony (CPSO#: 27968)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kieran A. Rogers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 301 18 Kensington Road Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016