Roggensack, Anne Marie (CPSO#: 75032)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2007