Rogoman, Edith Pauline (CPSO#: 18358)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1992