Rohani, Farrokh (CPSO#: 62009)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Iranian

Education:Universidad Tecnologica De Santiago, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2003