Roher, Luna Soberano (CPSO#: 59678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1206 Centre St.
Suite 302
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M9
Phone: (905) 597-1120
Fax: (905) 597-1126
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luna Soberano Roher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roher ( CPSO# 59678 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1206 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M9
Phone Number: (905) 597-1120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUNA SOBERANO ROHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1992 to 14 Sep 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1993 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992