Rohrbach, Marianne Elisabeth (CPSO#: 81661)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Bern, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 07 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 08 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2007