Rohringer, Martin Philip (CPSO#: 61157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Navy Hill Road
Saipan MP  96950
United States
Phone: (670) 236-8390

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Marianas Islands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN PHILIP ROHRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROHRINGER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1990