Roitman, Daryl Scott (CPSO#: 64488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 208
1333 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (647) 352-3674
Fax: (647) 352-3673
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl Roitman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Roitman ( CPSO# 64488 )

Business Address:
208 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (647) 352-2674

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARYL SCOTT ROITMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROITMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991