Rojas-Lievano, Fernando (CPSO#: 66091)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1997