Rojnica, Lillian Maria (CPSO#: 51503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ErinoakKids
1230 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5C 0A5
Phone: (905) 855-2690
Fax: (905)566 4606
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILLIAN MARIA ROJNICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROJNICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985