Rokosh, Elizabeth Teresa (CPSO#: 69154)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 22 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 22 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 21 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 1999 to 21 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2001