Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Roldan Lozano, Luis Oscar (CPSO#: 64822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad De El Salvador, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 43
2300 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M9M 2Y3
Phone: (416) 744-7227
Fax: (416) 744-8603
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roldan Lozano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Roldan Lozano ( CPSO# 64822 )

Business Address:
Unit 43
2300 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M9M 2Y3
Phone Number: (416) 744-7227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jan 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS OSCAR ROLDAN LOZANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROLDAN LOZANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jan 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 05 Feb 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 05 Feb 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jan 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1996