Romach-Sellers, Myroslava Katria (CPSO#: 53919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Baby Point Crescent
Toronto ON  M6S 2C1
Phone: (416) 617-8093
Fax: (416) 766-8981
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Perinatal Mental Health Unit
3rd Floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 8325
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYROSLAVA KATRIA ROMACH-SELLERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMACH-SELLERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1985