Romagnuolo, Joseph (CPSO#: 68150)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Mar 2010