Roman, Laszlo (CPSO#: 19325)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008