Romano, Clare Colleen (CPSO#: 58173)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2005