Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Romano, Walter Matthew (CPSO#: 57105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Xray Associates
104- 450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270
Fax: (519) 672-4459
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

189 Elm Street
Diagnostic Imaging Department
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
Phone: 519-631-2020 Ext. 2103
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter M. Romano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Romano ( CPSO# 57105 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Suite 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
Aylmer Ultrasound
6 - 418 Talbot Street West
Aylmer ON  N5H 1K9
Phone Number: (519) 773-3683

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER MATTHEW ROMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROMANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Aug 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987