Romans, Sarah Elizabeth (CPSO#: 46714)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2009