Rona, Zoltan Peter (CPSO#: 30224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 19
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: (905) 764-8700
Fax: (905) 764-6641
Electoral District: 05

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 4, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Zoltan Peter Rona, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rona to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ZOLTAN PETER RONA
                                          ("Dr. Rona")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rona, certificate of registration number 30224, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my standard of practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Review at least fifteen to twenty (15-20) of my patient
                              charts at every meeting;
                        (ii)  Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College once every month, or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of concern
                        identified by the College  and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (5) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that in making its determination that I
                        may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I
                        sign a further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and
                        limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring ongoing
                        re-assessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        thirty (30) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Rona, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (g) above, including
                        returning a signed Appendix "A" within thirty (30) days, I will
                        cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Rona, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out above and in
                        Appendix "A"  attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my
                        practice (the "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen
                        (15) charts, interviews with myself, colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under section (6) of this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rona, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)' recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the College will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (6)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the College has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rona, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                        conditions or limitations on my practice and/or which the College
                        has identified in its decision referenced in section (6)(d) above
                        as terms, conditions or limitations on my practice.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (8)   I, Dr. Rona, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may be returned for consideration by the College and/or may be the
                  subject of further action by the College, including a referral of
                  specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

            (9)   I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Rona, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information arising from the
                  monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Rona, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)