Roncaioli, Joseph (CPSO#: 18257)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: March 15, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Joseph Roncaioli undertakes to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that,
effective March 15, 2005, he will not practise medicine
in any jurisdiction.