Rondeau, Chantal (CPSO#: 64862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cite de la sante de Laval
1755 Rene laennec
Laval, Qc Canada
Laval QC  H7M 3L9
Phone: (450) 668-1010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL RONDEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RONDEAU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992