Rongen, Gerardus Antonius Petrus Josepha Maria (CPSO#: 70473)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Katholieke Universiteit, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1996