Rooney, Michael Andrew (CPSO#: 72779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone: (519) 753-1242
Fax: (519) 753-4925
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael A. Rooney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 72779 )

Business Address:
385 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone Number: (519) 753-1242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ANDREW ROONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003