Roopchand, Rupa Roma (CPSO#: 53238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Centre
401 Sunset Drive
St. Thomas, Ontario
N5R 3C6
St Thomas ON  N5P 3V9
Phone: (519) 631-8510 Ext. 49467
Fax: (519) 631-7527
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

510 Southdale Road East
Suite 301
London ON  N6E 1A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 690-2806 Ext. 4
Fax: (519) 690-2807
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afzal Mohammed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Roopchand ( CPSO# 53238 )
Dr. A. Mohammed ( CPSO# 53110 )

Business Address:
510 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 0B2
Phone Number: (519) 690-2808

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPA ROMA ROOPCHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOPCHAND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1987