Roopnarian, Indra Purbhoo Nath (CPSO#: 84046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 898-2240
Fax: (905) 898-2253
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roopnarian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Roopnarian ( CPSO# 84046 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-2240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDRA PURBHOO NATH ROOPNARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOPNARIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 09 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007