Roos, Jaan Olav (CPSO#: 19130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, Swedish

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 73 Cannon Road Toronto ON M8Y 1S2
Date Received: 27 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Feb 2017