Ropchan, Glorianne Victoria (CPSO#: 51508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-5937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ropchan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ropchan ( CPSO# 51508 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
Saint Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLORIANNE VICTORIA ROPCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROPCHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1986