Roper, Barbara Jo (CPSO#: 55035)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Oct 2006