Rosa, Louisa (CPSO#: 62584)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2008