Rosa Pereira dos Santos, Joana (CPSO#: 96477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Rio De Janerio, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Urology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 206580
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Joana Rosa Pereira dos Santos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Rosa Pereira dos
                        Santos holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Rosa Pereira dos Santos no longer holds
                  the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Rosa Pereira dos
                        Santos' clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Rosa Pereira dos
                        Santos' certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2022.