Rosati, Carl (CPSO#: 56866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Center
Mail Code 194
Department of Surgery
New Scotland Avenue
Albany NY  12208
United States
Phone: (518) 264-4834
Fax: (518) 264-4934

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARL ROSATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1989