Rosati, John Christopher (CPSO#: 63889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
Emergency Department
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: 519-426-0750
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Rosati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosati ( CPSO# 63889 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
Emergency Department
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTOPHER ROSATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992