Rose, Barry Francis (CPSO#: 53275)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2012