Rose, David Lance (CPSO#: 59500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
University of Western Ontario
Room 11
University Community Centre
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. DAVID LANCE ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989