Rose, Hugh Alexander (CPSO#: 15779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1996