Rose, James Neil (CPSO#: 86559)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario 25 King Street West Kingston, ON K7L 5P9
Date Received: 13 Jul 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 2015