Rose, Terence John (CPSO#: 22112)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS. 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 (416) 398-0638
Instructions: Patients may access copies of their medical records by contacting RSRS
Date Received: 23 Dec 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016