Rosebush, Patricia Irene (CPSO#: 53584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Psychiatry
St Joseph's Hospital
Fontbonne Building Suite F401
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33674
Fax: (905) 308-7202
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
Medical Psychiatry
237 Barton Street 4th Floor
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 308-7202
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster University Medical Centre
4V1 Clinic - Neuropsychiatry
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 905-308-7202
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosebush Mazurek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rosebush ( CPSO# 53584 )
Dr. M. Mazurek ( CPSO# 33718 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Suite F401
301 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3B6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 4U5
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA IRENE ROSEBUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEBUSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1986